Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB828 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Seliger S.B. No. 828
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2017;
 February 27, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Higher Education; April 20, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 20, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain academic programs and projects undertaken by
 public institutions of higher education at an off-campus academic
 or research site or a similar location.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.0512(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A new degree or certificate program may be added at an
 institution of higher education only with specific prior approval
 of the board. A degree or certificate program offered at an
 off-campus academic or research site is considered a new degree or
 certificate program if not previously offered at the off-campus
 academic or research site. A new degree or certificate program is
 considered approved if the board has not completed a review under
 this section and acted to approve or disapprove the proposed
 program before the first anniversary of the date on which an
 institution of higher education submits a completed application for
 approval to the board. The board may not summarily disapprove a
 program without completing the review required by this section.
 The board shall specify by rule the elements that constitute a
 completed application and shall make an administrative
 determination of the completeness of the application not later than
 the fifth business day after receiving the application. A request
 for additional information in support of an application that has
 been determined administratively complete does not toll the period
 within which the application is considered approved under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.0572(d), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The board may review purchases of improved real property
 added to an institution's educational and general buildings and
 facilities inventory to determine whether the property meets the
 standards adopted by the board for cost, efficiency, space need,
 and space use, but subject to Section 61.0584 the purchase of the
 improved real property is not contingent on board review or
 approval.  Standards must be adopted by the board using the
 negotiated rulemaking procedures under Chapter 2008, Government
 Code.  If the property does not meet those standards, the board
 shall notify the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of
 the house of representatives, the governing board of the applicable
 institution, and the Legislative Budget Board.  This subsection
 does not impair the board's authority to collect data relating to
 the improved real property that is added each year to the
 educational and general buildings and facilities inventory of
 institutions of higher education.
 SECTION 3.  Section 61.058(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The board may review all construction, repair, or
 rehabilitation of buildings and facilities at institutions of
 higher education to determine whether the construction,
 rehabilitation, or repair meets the standards adopted by board rule
 for cost, efficiency, space need, and space use, but subject to
 Section 61.0584 the construction, rehabilitation, or repair is not
 contingent on board review or approval.  Standards must be adopted
 by the board using the negotiated rulemaking procedures under
 Chapter 2008, Government Code.  If the construction,
 rehabilitation, or repair does not meet those standards, the board
 shall notify the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of
 the house of representatives, the governing boards of the
 applicable institutions, and the Legislative Budget Board.  This
 subsection does not impair the board's authority to collect data
 relating to the construction, repair, or rehabilitation of
 buildings and facilities occurring each year at institutions of
 higher education.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0584 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0584.  OFF-CAMPUS ACADEMIC OR RESEARCH SITE.
 (a)  This section does not apply to buildings and facilities that
 are located on an off-campus academic or research site, that are to
 be used exclusively for auxiliary enterprises, and that will not
 require appropriations from the legislature for operation,
 maintenance, or repair.
 (b)  Based on criteria established under Subsection (d), the
 board shall review and shall approve or disapprove an action taken
 by the governing board of an institution of higher education or
 university system, through purchase, lease, or otherwise, to:
 (1)  acquire improved or unimproved real property for
 use at a new or existing off-campus academic or research site; or
 (2)  acquire or construct a building or facility for
 use at a site described by Subdivision (1).
 (c)  The board, using the negotiated rulemaking procedures
 under Chapter 2008, Government Code, shall develop a procedure for
 each institution of higher education or university system to use to
 identify, for purposes of the board review required by this
 section, the scope and character of projects that are proposed for:
 (1)  an off-campus academic or research site, including
 projects relating to:
 (A)  a multi-institution teaching center (MITC);
 (B)  a medical school;
 (C)  a branch campus;
 (D)  a satellite campus; and
 (E)  a health science center; and
 (2)  any other location that is separate from the main
 campus of an institution and that is to be used for academic or
 research purposes.
 (d)  Using the negotiated rulemaking procedures under
 Chapter 2008, Government Code, the board shall establish criteria
 for reviewing and for approving or disapproving an action taken by
 the governing board of an institution of higher education or
 university system as described by Subsection (b). Criteria adopted
 under this subsection must prioritize the academic and research
 needs of institutions of higher education while preventing
 unnecessary duplication in program offerings, faculties, and
 physical plants.
 (e)  Information related to the board's findings and
 determinations under this section is not subject to the required
 disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (f)  The board may conduct a closed meeting pursuant to
 Section 551.072, Government Code, to deliberate the approval or
 disapproval of any action subject to that section and taken by the
 governing board of an institution of higher education or university
 system as described by Subsection (b). As necessary and
 appropriate, the board may hold its closed meeting as an emergency
 meeting under Section 551.045, Government Code.
 (g)  The board shall report its findings and determinations
 under this section to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, the Legislative Budget
 Board, and the governing boards of the applicable institutions of
 higher education or university systems.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a proposal for acquisition or construction made on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  A proposal for acquisition or
 construction made before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the proposal was made, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *