House | 05/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |