House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2458 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1688 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |