Senate | 05/03/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 485 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |