Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB865 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/14/2017

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 865
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017; February 27, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water &
 Rural Affairs; March 14, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 14, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a groundwater conservation district's use of electronic
 fund transfers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 36.151(b) and (c), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Disbursements, other than federal reserve wire
 transfers or electronic fund transfers, shall be signed by at least
 two directors, except the board may by resolution allow certain
 employees of the district, or a combination of employees and
 directors, to sign disbursements on behalf of the board.  The board
 may authorize payroll disbursements by electronic direct deposit.
 (c)  The board may by resolution allow disbursements to be
 transferred by federal reserve wire system, or by electronic means,
 to accounts in the name of the district or accounts not in the name
 of the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *