Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB877 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 877
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017;
 February 28, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; April 12, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to liability of certain political subdivisions in certain
 workers' compensation actions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.053(e), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e)  Nothing in this chapter waives sovereign immunity or
 creates a new cause of action, except that a political subdivision
 that self-insures either individually or collectively is liable for
 attorney's fees as provided by Section 417.003.
 SECTION 2.  Section 504.053, Labor Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to a third-party action under Chapter 417, Labor
 Code, commenced on or after the effective date of this Act.  A
 third-party action under Chapter 417, Labor Code, commenced before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law applicable to
 the action immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *