Senate | 05/23/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2877 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 920 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 359 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 359 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |