E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3141
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4566
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2546
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1327
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1315
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Clardy
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1447
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 950
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 950
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|