Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB966 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2017

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 966
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2017; March 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 966 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to criminal offenses regarding the consumption or
 possession of alcoholic beverages by a minor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 106.04, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
 (f)  Except as provided by Subsection (g), Subsection (a)
 does not apply to a minor who reports the sexual assault of the
 minor or another person, or is the victim of a sexual assault
 reported by another person, to:
 (1)  a health care provider treating the victim of the
 sexual assault;
 (2)  an employee of a law enforcement agency, including
 an employee of a campus police department of an institution of
 higher education; or
 (3)  the Title IX coordinator of an institution of
 higher education or another employee of the institution responsible
 for responding to reports of sexual assault.
 (g)  A minor who commits a sexual assault that is reported
 under Subsection (f) is not entitled to raise the defense provided
 by Subsection (f) in the prosecution of the minor for an offense
 under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 106.05, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), Subsection (a)
 does not apply to a minor who reports the sexual assault of the
 minor or another person, or is the victim of a sexual assault
 reported by another person, to:
 (1)  a health care provider treating the victim of the
 sexual assault;
 (2)  an employee of a law enforcement agency, including
 an employee of a campus police department of an institution of
 higher education; or
 (3)  the Title IX coordinator of an institution of
 higher education or another employee of the institution responsible
 for responding to reports of sexual assault.
 (f)  A minor who commits a sexual assault that is reported
 under Subsection (e) is not entitled to raise the defense provided
 by Subsection (e) in the prosecution of the minor for an offense
 under this section.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *