E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4148
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4148
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 931
|
Journal Page: 4147
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5771
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2609
|
Journal Page: 5770
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3886
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5509
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5509
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1418
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3848
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Alvarado and Leach
|
Journal Page: 3847
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3847
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1682
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1682
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1447
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 956
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|