Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB970 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson, Zaffirini S.B. No. 970
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2017; March 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 5, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 5, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 970 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a sexual assault policy at public and private
 institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.9363, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9363.  [CAMPUS] SEXUAL ASSAULT POLICY. (a)  In this
 section, "postsecondary educational institution" means an
 ["]institution of higher education or a private or independent
 institution of higher education, as those terms are defined[" has
 the meaning assigned] by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each postsecondary educational institution [of higher
 education] shall adopt a policy on [campus] sexual assault
 applicable to each student enrolled at and each employee of the
 institution.  The policy must:
 (1)  include:
 (A)  definitions of prohibited behavior;
 (B)  sanctions for violations; and
 (C)  the protocol for reporting and responding to
 reports of [campus] sexual assault; and
 (2)  be approved by the institution's governing board
 before final adoption by the institution.
 (c)  Each postsecondary educational institution [of higher
 education] shall make the institution's [campus] sexual assault
 policy available to students, faculty, and staff members by:
 (1)  including the policy in the institution's student
 handbook and personnel handbook; and
 (2)  creating and maintaining a web page on the
 institution's Internet website dedicated solely to the policy.
 (d)  Each postsecondary educational institution [of higher
 education] shall require each entering freshman or undergraduate
 transfer student to attend an orientation on the institution's
 [campus] sexual assault policy before or during the first semester
 or term in which the student is enrolled at the institution.  The
 institution shall establish the format and content of the
 orientation.
 (e)  Each postsecondary educational institution shall
 develop and implement a public awareness campaign to inform
 students enrolled at and employees of the institution of the
 institution's sexual assault policy.
 (f)  Each biennium, each postsecondary educational
 institution [of higher education] shall review the institution's
 [campus] sexual assault policy and, with approval of the
 institution's governing board, revise the policy as necessary.
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.9363, Education Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2017 fall semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *