House | 05/23/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2643 | |
House | 03/23/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 837 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 682 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 576 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 393 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 393 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |