E | 05/10/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1829 | |
E | 05/03/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1638 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2295 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1563 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1369 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2016 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | RV#494 | Journal Page: 2017 |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2017 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2017 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1990 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1990 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 536 | Journal Page: 1990 |
House | 04/24/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1474 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 406 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 406 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |