House
|
05/24/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4803
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2643
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2643
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1704
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|