E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1981
|
Journal Page: 5755
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5755
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3847
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5510
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5510
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3286
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1322
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Thierry
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3641
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Schofield
|
Journal Page: 3640
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3639
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1518
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1518
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1518
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1518
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Hughes
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1517
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1516
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1285
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|