Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR1 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill November 14, 2016

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2017
Bill April 10, 2017