House | 05/12/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 3151 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1250 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1250 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1250 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1249 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |