E | 05/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1829 | |
E | 05/01/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1534 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1372 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1344 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2013 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2013 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1574 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1422 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 920 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 920 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |