House | 03/28/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |