House | 05/11/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |