Senate | 04/26/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |