Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR51 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 12, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017