|
05/23/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|