06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/29/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/28/2017 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/28/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 05/28/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/28/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |