Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR59 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2017

                            S.C.R. No. 59


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Senate Bill No. 1566 has been adopted by the house
 of representatives and the senate and is being prepared for
 enrollment; and
 WHEREAS, The bill contains technical and typographical
 errors that should be corrected; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, by the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 the enrolling clerk of the senate be instructed to make the
 following corrections:
 (1)  In SECTION 8 of the bill, as added by Floor Amendment
 No. 8 by Gooden, abolishing county boards of education, boards of
 county school trustees, and the offices of county school
 superintendent in certain counties, remove the underlining
 throughout the text of that SECTION.
 (2)  In SECTION 8 of the bill, as added by Floor Amendment
 No. 8 by Gooden, in added Subsection (j) of the SECTION, strike
 "September 1, 2017" and substitute "November 15, 2017".
 (3)  In SECTION 9 of the bill, as added by Floor Amendment
 No. 8 by Gooden, repealing Chapter 266 (S.B. 394), Acts of the 40th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1927 (Article 2700a, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes), remove the underlining throughout the text of that
 SECTION.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 59 was adopted by the Senate
 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 59 was adopted by the House
 on May 29, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0,
 one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House