E | 01/24/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 101 | |
House | 01/24/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 41 | |
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 43 | |
Senate | 01/17/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 38 | |
House | 01/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 22 | |
House | 01/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#3 | Journal Page: 22 |
House | 01/11/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 22 | |
House | 01/11/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 22 | |
House | 01/11/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 157 | |
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 18 | |
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 18 | |
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 18 | |
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 18 | |
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |