House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 3151 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | CA1 Nichols | Journal Page: 1179 |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1179 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably as amended | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 191 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 174 | |
Senate | 01/11/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |