Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR1 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Campbell, et al. S.J.R. No. 1
2- (Fallon)
1+S.J.R. No. 1
32
43
54 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
65 to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part
76 of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving
87 spouse of a first responder who is killed or fatally injured in the
98 line of duty.
109 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1110 SECTION 1. Section 1-b, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
1211 is amended by adding Subsections (o) and (p) to read as follows:
1312 (o) The legislature by general law may provide that the
1413 surviving spouse of a first responder who is killed or fatally
1514 injured in the line of duty is entitled to an exemption from ad
1615 valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the surviving
1716 spouse's residence homestead if the surviving spouse has not
1817 remarried since the death of the first responder. The legislature
1918 by general law may define "first responder" for purposes of this
2019 subsection and may prescribe additional eligibility requirements
2120 for the exemption authorized by this subsection.
2221 (p) The legislature by general law may provide that a
2322 surviving spouse who qualifies for and receives an exemption in
2423 accordance with Subsection (o) of this section and who subsequently
2524 qualifies a different property as the surviving spouse's residence
2625 homestead is entitled to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of
2726 the subsequently qualified homestead in an amount equal to the
2827 dollar amount of the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the first
2928 homestead for which the exemption was received in accordance with
3029 Subsection (o) of this section in the last year in which the
3130 surviving spouse received the exemption in accordance with that
3231 subsection for that homestead if the surviving spouse has not
3332 remarried since the death of the first responder.
3433 SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to
3534 the Texas Constitution:
3635 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
3736 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
3837 Regular Session, 2017, authorizing the legislature to provide for
3938 an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market
4039 value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a first
4140 responder who is killed or fatally injured in the line of duty.
4241 (b) Sections 1-b(o) and (p), Article VIII, of this
4342 constitution take effect January 1, 2018, and apply only to a tax
4443 year beginning on or after that date.
4544 (c) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2019.
4645 SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
4746 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
4847 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
4948 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
5049 legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of
5150 all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the
5251 surviving spouse of a first responder who is killed or fatally
5352 injured in the line of duty."
53+ ______________________________ ______________________________
54+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
55+ I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 1 was adopted by the Senate
56+ on March 13, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
57+ ______________________________
58+ Secretary of the Senate
59+ I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 1 was adopted by the House
60+ on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, two
61+ present not voting.
62+ ______________________________
63+ Chief Clerk of the House