E
|
05/11/2017
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3385
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3237
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1819
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#746
|
Journal Page: 2533
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2533
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2533
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Turner
|
Journal Page: 2532
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Miller
|
Journal Page: 2531
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2530
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2078
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 529
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 395
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 356
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 356
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 356
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 355
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
Senate
|
02/28/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 354
|
Senate
|
02/27/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 311
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 237
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 139
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 119
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 119
|
Senate
|
12/06/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|