Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR31 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst S.J.R. No. 31
 (In the Senate - Filed January 19, 2017; January 23, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 January 24, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; January 24, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to appropriations
 for the preservation and perpetuation of certain items of
 historical value; allowing the legislature and state agencies to
 accept on behalf of the state gifts of items of historical value and
 contributions to purchase such items.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.  The Legislature may, from time to time, make
 appropriations for preserving and perpetuating memorials of the
 history of Texas, by means of monuments, statues, paintings, films,
 videotapes, audiotapes, computer files or other electronic storage
 media, and documents of historical value. The Legislature or an
 agency of the state may accept on behalf of the state gifts of items
 of historical value and contributions to purchase items of
 historical value.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment allowing the
 legislature to make appropriations for preserving and perpetuating
 certain items of historical value and allowing the legislature and
 state agencies to accept on behalf of the state gifts of items of
 historical value and contributions to preserve and perpetuate such
 items."
 * * * * *