House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 3603 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3603 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3025 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1715 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1715 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1715 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1714 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1714 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1714 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Estes | Journal Page: 1714 |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1714 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1714 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1714 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1637 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |