Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR166 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/13/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 166
 WHEREAS, Citizens from Hill County are visiting Austin to
 celebrate Hill County Day at the State Capitol on February 22,
 2017, and it is indeed appropriate to take this opportunity to
 pay tribute to this notable Texas county; and
 WHEREAS, Located in North Central Texas east of the Brazos
 River, Hill County was created from a section of Navarro County
 by an act of the state legislature on February 7, 1853; it was
 named for Dr. George Washington Hill, a member of the Congress of
 the Republic of Texas and secretary of war and the navy under
 President Sam Houston; on May 14, 1853, an election was held in
 Lexington on Jack's Branch to determine the county's first public
 officials, and later that same year, Hillsboro was platted and
 designated the county seat; and
 WHEREAS, Now home to about 35,000 people, Hill County has
 grown with the changing times while still maintaining the appeal
 of a small rural county; the restored county courthouse in
 Hillsboro, which is listed in the National Register of Historic
 Places, serves as the center for county business, and Hill
 College provides access to an array of high-technology academic
 and workforce-training programs, presents a popular performing
 arts series, and is the site of the Texas Heritage Museum, which
 has an extensive collection of Audie Murphy artifacts and a
 comprehensive library and archive on the Civil War; and
 WHEREAS, Of special interest to Texas music fans
 everywhere, Hill County is the birthplace of legendary singer and
 songwriter Willie Nelson, who was born in Abbott and graduated
 from high school there; and
 WHEREAS, Hill County communities host a number of special
 events each year, among them the Hill County Fair, the Cotton
 Pickin' Fair, and the Cinco de Mayo Celebration in Hillsboro,
 Pioneer Days in Whitney, and Hubbard City Trade Days; these
 festivities showcase the county's hospitality, agricultural
 roots, scenic beauty, and heritage; residents and visitors alike
 also enjoy the myriad recreational opportunities offered by Lake
 Whitney State Park; and
 WHEREAS, Those who call Hill County home take justifiable
 pride in their county's distinctive character and the many qualities
 that make it such an outstanding place in which to live, work, and
 raise a family; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby recognize February 22, 2017, as Hill County
 Day at the State Capitol and extend to the visiting delegation
 sincere best wishes for an enjoyable stay in Austin.
 Birdwell
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 13, 2017.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate