Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR220 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/21/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 220
 In Memory
 of
 Billy Pat Martin
 WHEREAS, A life filled with meaningful accomplishments
 drew to a close with the passing of Billy Pat Martin of
 Daingerfield on July 3, 2016, at the age of 89; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Sulphur Bluff on June 22, 1927, to Murley
 and Kate Martin, Bill Martin grew up with the companionship of
 his sister, the late LaVerne Martin Hicks; he married the love of
 his life, Betty Lynn Dalby, on July 10, 1953, in what was the
 first wedding held in the new sanctuary of the First Methodist
 Church of Daingerfield; the proud father of two sons, Billy John
 and Walter Lee, he later saw his family grow to include four
 grandchildren and six great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Answering his nation's call to duty, Mr. Martin
 served in the United States Army near the end of World War II; he
 went on to work for Lone Star Steel Company, and he was co-owner
 of Martin's General Merchandise, Martin's Auto Parts, and
 Martin's Tax and Bookkeeping Service, continuing his productive
 work life until retiring at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted family man, a proud veteran, and a
 dedicated business owner, Bill Martin leaves behind a legacy that
 will continue to inspire all those who had the good fortune to
 know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Billy Pat Martin
 and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family:  to
 his wife, Betty; to his sons, Billy John Martin and his wife,
 Jackie, and Walter Lee Martin and his wife, Jill; to his
 grandchildren, Paul and Brian Martin, Terry Runk, and Nichole
 Waddill; to his great-grandchildren, Caytlyn and William Jack
 Martin, Graci and Maggie Runk, and Ashten and Maylee Waddill; and
 to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do
 so in memory of Bill Martin.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 21, 2017,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate