Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR229 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/21/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 229
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas is pleased to
 join citizens around the state in celebrating July 21, 2017, as
 First Lady Frances Cox Henderson Day; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Philadelphia on July 21, 1820, Frances Cox
 was educated in Europe; she met James Pinckney Henderson in Paris
 when he was serving as the envoy from the Republic of Texas to the
 Tuileries Palace, and the couple married in London in 1839; they
 moved to San Augustine, Texas, the following year; and
 WHEREAS, James Henderson was elected the first governor of
 Texas in 1845; during his term, the Texas First Lady worked to
 establish Episcopalian churches in East Texas, and in her
 efforts, she became the first woman to address the clergy of the
 diocese; and
 WHEREAS, The family moved to Marshall, Texas, in 1856, and
 Mrs. Henderson continued her endeavor to promote the
 Episcopalian Church by establishing the Trinity Episcopal Church
 in her new hometown; in addition to tirelessly supporting the
 church, she was an active supporter of women's suffrage; and
 WHEREAS, In 1857, Mr. Henderson was appointed to fill the
 seat of United States Senator Thomas J. Rusk, who died during his
 term in office; Mr. Henderson's health declined quickly after
 taking office, and he passed away later that same year;
 Mrs. Henderson eventually moved to New Jersey, where she spent her
 remaining years as a community leader in East Orange; she died in
 her daughter's home on January 25, 1897; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby recognize July 21, 2017, as First Lady
 Frances Cox Henderson Day in Texas and encourage citizens around
 the state to honor the memory of Lady Frances Cox Henderson as the
 first First Lady of the Lone Star State; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 the State of Texas Anniversary Remembrance Day Foundation as a
 token of esteem from the Texas Senate.
 Nichols
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 21, 2017.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate