Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR25 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/23/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 25
 In Memory
 of
 Sandra Longoria Yturria
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Sandra Longoria Yturria, who died
 November 17, 2015, at the age of 71; and
 WHEREAS, Sandra Yturria was born September 13, 1944, in
 Houston; she was adopted by her loving parents, Mildred and
 Shelby Longoria, and grew up in Matamoros, Tamaulipas, Mexico; a
 1963 graduate of Saint Mary's Hall in San Antonio, she attended
 Finch College in New York City; and
 WHEREAS, She and her beloved husband, Fausto Yturria Jr.,
 married on June 28, 1964, at Sacred Heart Church in Brownsville;
 the couple enjoyed 51 years of marriage, and they were blessed
 with three children and three grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, She was as at ease on the shooting range as she was
 hosting an elegant dinner party, and her love of travel and her
 exquisite taste were evident in the stylish homes she created;
 she was active in such civic organizations as the San Antonio
 Country Club, the Argyle, Club Giraud, and Shikar Safari Club
 International; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Yturria was a devout Christian who practiced
 her faith in her daily life and was a member of Sacred Heart
 Church; a woman of courage, strength, and compassion, she gave
 generously to others, and her joyful countenance, her ability to
 touch the lives of others, and her enthusiasm for living each day
 to the fullest will not be forgotten; and
 WHEREAS, She was a devoted wife, mother, and grandmother,
 and she leaves behind memories that will be treasured forever by
 her family and countless friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Sandra Longoria Yturria; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Sandra Longoria Yturria.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 23, 2017, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate