Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR31 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/23/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 31
 In Memory
 of
 Anita Palmer Hackley
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Jacksboro in mourning the loss of Anita Palmer
 Hackley, who died on January 6, 2017, at the age of 71; and
 WHEREAS, Anita Palmer Hackley was born on July 29, 1945, in
 Altus, Oklahoma, to Wallace William Smith and Lottie Ann Smith; and
 WHEREAS, She married Johnny T. Palmer, who passed away in
 2008; she married John Hackley on August 17, 2013, in Jacksboro,
 where they made their home; she leaves behind three sons, a
 daughter, and many grandchildren and great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Hackley was retired from her work in the
 field of education; she was a former president of the Olney
 Retired Teachers Association and vice-president of District IX
 Retired Teachers Association, and she was on the board of
 directors of the Texas Teacher Retirement System; a leader in the
 community, she served as president of the Hamilton Hospital
 Foundation and as a consumer member of the Texas State Board of
 Vocational Nursing; and
 WHEREAS, A highly talented artist, Mrs. Hackley was a
 special selected member of Women Artists of the West, a member of
 the National Association of Oil and Acrylic Painters, and a
 member of the American Association of Equine Artists; and
 WHEREAS, A faithful Christian, Anita was an active member
 of The Parish of Jacksboro and was director of the Faith
 Community Hospital Foundation of Jacksboro; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of integrity, strength, and generosity,
 Anita gave unselfishly of her time to others, and her wisdom,
 warmth, and valued counsel will not be forgotten by those who
 knew her; and
 WHEREAS, Anita Hackley was a devoted wife, mother, and
 grandmother, and she leaves behind memories that will be treasured
 forever by her family and many friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Anita Palmer Hackley; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Anita Palmer Hackley.
 Estes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 23, 2017, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate