Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR339 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/01/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 339
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas is pleased to
 join Texans across the state in celebrating the 181st anniversary
 of the adoption of the Texas Declaration of Independence on
 March 2, 2017; and
 WHEREAS, After several years of rising tensions between
 the people of Texas and the government of Mexico, a convention of
 delegates from communities across Texas was called to gather in
 the town of Washington on March 1, 1836; and
 WHEREAS, On the first day of the convention, George
 C. Childress introduced a resolution calling for the drafting of
 a declaration of independence from Mexico; the measure was
 approved, and Mr. Childress was named chair of the drafting
 committee; the next day, the committee produced a document
 patterned on the United States Declaration of Independence, and
 it was unanimously adopted less than one hour after its initial
 reading; and
 WHEREAS, The convention went on to name Sam Houston as
 commanding general of the Texas army, adopt a constitution for
 the Republic of Texas, and elect an interim government; chosen to
 serve in the new government were David G. Burnet, president,
 Lorenzo de Zavala, vice president, Samuel P. Carson, secretary of
 state, Thomas J. Rusk, secretary of war, Robert Potter, secretary
 of the navy, Bailey Hardeman, secretary of the treasury, and
 David Thomas, attorney general; and
 WHEREAS, On March 15, news reached the convention of the
 falloftheAlamo,andtwodayslater, reportsthattheMexican
 army was within 60 miles of Washington caused the convention to
 adjourn; this setback was reversed less than a month later when
 the Mexican army was routed at the Battle of San Jacinto and Texas
 independence became a reality; and
 WHEREAS, Texas remained an independent republic until
 December 29, 1845, when it entered the United States as the 28th
 state; its time as an independent nation constitutes a remarkable
 period in the state's history and continues to engender a sense
 of pride and identity among its citizens; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby commemorate the 181st anniversary of the
 adoption of the Texas Declaration of Independence and extend to
 Texans everywhere best wishes for a memorable Texas Independence
 Day; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared in
 honor of this special occasion.
 Creighton
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 1, 2017.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate