Senate | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Permission to introduce | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |