Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR76

Caption

Recognizing January 31, 2017, as Brownsville Day.

Impact

By designating a specific day to honor the citizens of Brownsville, the resolution serves to highlight the importance of local communities within the state. It acknowledges the unique economic assets and vibrant culture of Brownsville, promoting awareness and appreciation of its historical significance. The resolution also aligns with ongoing community initiatives, such as the Imagine Brownsville Comprehensive Plan, which seeks to enhance the region's development through cultural preservation and respect for its diverse background.

Summary

Senate Resolution No. 76 recognizes January 31, 2017, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol, celebrating the contributions and cultural significance of Brownsville, Texas. The resolution commends the citizens of Brownsville for their role in the growth and prosperity of the state and acknowledges the city's historical roots dating back to its charter in 1848. Named in honor of Major Jacob Brown, Brownsville has evolved into an essential center for cultural heritage, bridging the traditions of both the United States and Mexico.

Contention

While the resolution is largely a unifying gesture, notable points of contention may arise regarding the representation of cultural narratives within legislative recognitions. Critics may argue that such resolutions potentially overlook challenges faced by local communities or that similar recognitions should also extend to other cities with rich legacies. However, the overall sentiment remains one of celebration and respect, aiming to foster unity and pride among Texans, particularly those from Brownsville.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR128

Recognizing January 25, 2011, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR216

Recognizing February 4, 2009, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR72

Recognizing January 25, 2011, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR66

Recognizing January 29, 2013, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR116

Recognizing February 4, 2009, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR222

Recognizing January 28, 2015, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR243

Recognizing January 29, 2013, as Brownsville Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR6

Recognizing the Brownsville Chamber of Commerce on the occasion of its 84th anniversary.