Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR860 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2017

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 860
 In Memory
 of
 Joseph Ray Perry
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Joseph Ray Perry, who died
 April 27, 2017, at the age of 92; and
 WHEREAS, Ray Perry was an exemplary citizen and a
 hardworking West Texas farmer who loved his land and was
 dedicated to serving his community; and
 WHEREAS, He was born on April 23, 1925, in the Haskell
 County community of Paint Creek to Hoyt and Thelma Perry; a
 lifelong resident of Haskell County, he served the nation with
 distinction in the United States Army Air Corps during World War
 II; he flew 35 missions over Nazi Germany as a tail gunner in B-17
 bombers, and he was awarded multiple medals for his exemplary
 service; and
 WHEREAS, He married Amelia June Holt at the Haskell
 Methodist Church on June 29, 1948, and the couple enjoyed nearly
 70 years of marriage together; they raised two children, Milla
 Perry Jones and James Richard "Rick" Perry, and they were blessed
 with three grandchildren and two great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to working his land, Ray Perry was
 active in a wide range of political and community endeavors; he
 served for nearly 30 years as a Haskell County commissioner and
 for 10 years as a member of the Paint Creek school board; he
 served for six years on the West Central Texas Council of
 Governments, and he was instrumental in the creation of the Paint
 Creek Water Corporation and twice served as its president; and
 WHEREAS, An avid hunter and outdoorsman, he was known for
 his numerous wild game trophies; one of the highlights of his
 hunting trips was killing an Alaskan first-class caribou that has
 been listed in the Guinness Book of World Records; and
 WHEREAS, Ray Perry was a man of courage, faith, and
 patriotism; he gave unselfishly to others and to his community,
 and his enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest will not be
 forgotten by those who were privileged to share in his life; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, father, and grandfather,
 and he leaves behind memories that will be cherished forever by
 his family and many friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Joseph Ray Perry; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Joseph Ray Perry.
 Perry
 Bettencourt Hinojosa Rodríguez Bettencourt Hinojosa Rodríguez
Bettencourt Hinojosa Rodríguez
 Birdwell Huffines Schwertner Birdwell Huffines Schwertner
Birdwell Huffines Schwertner
 Buckingham Huffman Seliger Buckingham Huffman Seliger
Buckingham Huffman Seliger
 Burton Hughes Taylor of Collin Burton Hughes Taylor of Collin
Burton Hughes Taylor of Collin
 Campbell Kolkhorst Taylor of Galveston Campbell Kolkhorst Taylor of Galveston
Campbell Kolkhorst Taylor of Galveston
 Creighton Lucio Uresti Creighton Lucio Uresti
Creighton Lucio Uresti
 Estes Menéndez Watson Estes Menéndez Watson
Estes Menéndez Watson
 Garcia Miles West Garcia Miles West
Garcia Miles West
 Hall Nelson Whitmire Hall Nelson Whitmire
Hall Nelson Whitmire
 Hancock Nichols Zaffirini Hancock Nichols Zaffirini
Hancock Nichols Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 23, 2017, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

Bettencourt Hinojosa Rodríguez

Birdwell Huffines Schwertner

Buckingham Huffman Seliger

Burton Hughes Taylor of Collin

Campbell Kolkhorst Taylor of Galveston

Creighton Lucio Uresti

Estes Menéndez Watson

Garcia Miles West

Hall Nelson Whitmire

Hancock Nichols Zaffirini