Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR884 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2017

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 884
 In Memory
 of
 Barbara Diane Madden
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life filled with joyful times and
 meaningful accomplishments remain to comfort the family and
 friends of Barbara Diane Madden of Richardson, who passed away on
 March 30, 2017, at the age of 74; and
 WHEREAS, The former Barbara Szumachowski was born on
 November 15, 1942, in Schenectady, New York, to Stephen and
 Bernice Szumachowski; following her graduation from high school,
 she was accepted to Ellis Hospital Nursing School, and she soon
 thereafter met the love of her life, Jerry Madden, a cadet at West
 Point Military Academy; after finishing school, the couple
 exchanged wedding vows on June 20, 1965; and
 WHEREAS, While her husband continued his training in the
 military, Mrs. Madden began her nursing career at Ellis
 Hospital; the couple eventually relocated to Baumholder,
 Germany, where Mr. Madden was stationed, and Mrs. Madden worked
 on base as a school nurse at the German American School; when her
 husband was overseas in Vietnam, she returned stateside and
 devoted herself to raising their family, which grew to include
 three children, Jerry, Stephanie, and Kristina; and
 WHEREAS, The family moved to Richardson, Texas, in 1971,
 after the end of Mr. Madden's enlistment; embracing the Lone Star
 State as her new home, Mrs. Madden served as a nurse in the infant
 ward at Richardson Memorial Hospital before going on to work for
 morethan20yearsatHeritageManorNursingHome,andshecared
 for the residents there with the same compassion and sensitivity
 that she had shown throughout her career; and
 WHEREAS, A member of the Anne Armstrong Republican Women's
 Club and the Plano Republican Women's Club, Mrs. Madden also
 generously supported her husband as he served as the Collin
 County Republican Party chair and as a member of the Texas House
 of Representatives; she was a faithful congregant at Saint Mark
 the Evangelist Catholic Church in Plano, and she enjoyed watching
 old movies and decorating her home for every season; to her loved
 ones, she was always a pillar of strength, and she knew no greater
 happiness than spending time with her husband, children, and
 grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Barbara Madden led a caring and purposeful life,
 and she will forever be remembered with deep affection by all who
 held her close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 85th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Barbara Diane
 Madden and extend sincere sympathy to all those who mourn her
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of high regard from the Texas Senate.
 Taylor of Collin
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 25, 2017, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate