Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 18, 2017

Engrossed

Bill August 4, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill August 12, 2017
Bill August 1, 2017