House | 07/31/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/31/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 07/20/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 07/20/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 07/19/2017 | Filed |