Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB274 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 07/21/2017

                            85S11149 CAE-D
 By: Schubert H.B. No. 274


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extension of additional state aid for tax reduction
 provided to certain school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 ARTICLE 1.  EXTENSION OF ADDITIONAL STATE AID FOR TAX REDUCTION
 SECTION 1.01.  Section 42.2516(c-1), Education Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Revenue generated by the portion of a district's
 maintenance and operations tax rate included in calculating the
 district's compressed tax rate under Section 42.101(a-1) and local
 share under Section 42.252(a-1) is included in determining the
 amount to which a district is entitled under this section, but may
 not increase the total amount of revenue per weighted student to
 which the district is entitled under this section.  This subsection
 expires September 1, 2019 [2017].
 SECTION 1.02.  Section 42.2518(a), Education Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For the 2015-2016 through 2018-2019 [and 2016-2017]
 school years, a school district is entitled to additional state aid
 to the extent that state and local revenue under this chapter and
 Chapter 41 is less than the state and local revenue that would have
 been available to the district under Chapter 41 and this chapter as
 those chapters existed on September 1, 2015, if the increase in the
 residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII,
 Texas Constitution, and the additional limitation on tax increases
 under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by S.J.R. 1, 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, had not occurred.
 SECTION 1.03.  Effective September 1, 2019, Section
 42.2518(a), Education Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning with the 2019-2020 school year [For the
 2015-2016 and 2016-2017 school years], a school district is
 entitled to additional state aid to the extent that state and local
 revenue under this chapter and Chapter 41 is less than the state and
 local revenue that would have been available to the district under
 Chapter 41 and this chapter as those chapters existed on September
 1, 2015, excluding any state aid that would have been provided under
 former Section 42.2516, if the increase in the residence homestead
 exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 and the additional limitation on tax increases under Section 1-b(d)
 of that article as proposed by S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, had not occurred.
 SECTION 1.04.  Notwithstanding Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of
 the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, the following
 provisions are effective September 1, 2019:
 (1)  Section 57.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 12.106(a), Education Code;
 (2)  Section 57.18, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended the heading to
 Section 42.2516, Education Code;
 (3)  Section 57.19, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 42.2516(a), Education Code;
 (4)  Section 57.23, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 42.253(h), Education Code;
 (5)  Section 57.29, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 26.08(i), Tax Code;
 (6)  Section 57.32(a), Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which repealed various
 provisions of the Education Code; and
 (7)  Section 57.32(b), Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which repealed Sections
 26.08(i-1) and (j), Tax Code.
 SECTION 1.05.  Section 42.2518(e), Education Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 1.06.  Section 18, Chapter 465 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Section
 42.2518, Education Code, effective September 1, 2017, is repealed.
 ARTICLE 2.  PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL STATE AID FOR TAX REDUCTION
 SECTION 2.01.  Subchapter E, Chapter 42, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 42.25162 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.25162.  ADDITIONAL STATE AID FOR TAX REDUCTION. (a)
 A school district is entitled to the additional state aid for the
 2017-2018 and 2018-2019 school years that would have been provided
 to the district for those school years under Section 42.2516, as
 that section existed on January 1, 2017, based on the percentage
 reduction for purposes of former Section 42.2516(i) established by
 appropriation for the 2016-2017 school year.
 (b)  Additional funding to which a school district is
 entitled under Section 42.2523 or 42.2524 is in addition to the
 amount of funding to which the district is entitled under this
 section.
 (c)  For purposes of Section 26.08(i), Tax Code, state funds
 distributed to a district under this section are included.
 (d)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.02.  Section 42.2518(a), Education Code, as
 effective September 1, 2017, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning with the 2017-2018 school year, a school
 district is entitled to additional state aid to the extent that
 state and local revenue under this chapter and Chapter 41 is less
 than the state and local revenue that would have been available to
 the district under Chapter 41 and this chapter as those chapters
 existed on September 1, 2015, [excluding any state aid that would
 have been provided under former Section 42.2516,] if the increase
 in the residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article
 VIII, Texas Constitution, and the additional limitation on tax
 increases under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by
 S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, had not
 occurred.
 SECTION 2.03.  Effective September 1, 2019, Section
 42.2518(a), Education Code, as effective September 1, 2017, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning with the 2019-2020 [2017-2018] school year, a
 school district is entitled to additional state aid to the extent
 that state and local revenue under this chapter and Chapter 41 is
 less than the state and local revenue that would have been available
 to the district under Chapter 41 and this chapter as those chapters
 existed on September 1, 2015, excluding any state aid that would
 have been provided under former Section 42.25162 [42.2516], if the
 increase in the residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c),
 Article VIII, Texas Constitution, and the additional limitation on
 tax increases under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by
 S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, had not
 occurred.
 ARTICLE 3.  EFFECTIVE DATE
 SECTION 3.01.  (a)  Except as otherwise provided by this
 subsection, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote
 of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided
 by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act takes
 effect immediately, Article 2 of this Act has no effect.
 (b)  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act, except as otherwise provided by this
 subsection, takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session. If this Act takes effect on the 91st day after
 the last day of the legislative session, Article 1 of this Act has
 no effect.