Senate | 08/14/2017 | Postponed | ||
Senate | 08/11/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 08/11/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 08/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 08/07/2017 | Referred to Government Reform, Select | ||
Senate | 08/07/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 08/04/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 08/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Passed as amended | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 08/03/2017 | Amended | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Vote reconsidered | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 08/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 07/31/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/31/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 07/27/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 07/26/2017 | Filed |