Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB328 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 07/26/2017

                            85S10895 JG-D
 By: Davis of Harris H.B. No. 328


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to emergency health care services and trauma care systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 773.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 773.026.  EMERGENCY HEALTH CARE SERVICES COORDINATION
 PLAN. (a) The administrative cooperatives designated under
 Section 773.125, in consultation with each trauma service area
 regional advisory council and the advisory council established by
 Section 773.012, shall collectively develop a written 25-year plan
 for coordinating emergency health care services throughout this
 state.
 (b)  The emergency health care services coordination plan
 must include strategies to provide services for:
 (1)  trauma care;
 (2)  stroke care;
 (3)  cardiac care;
 (4)  neonatal care;
 (5)  maternal care;
 (6)  mental health crisis care;
 (7)  emergency medical services coordination; and
 (8)  any other area of care provided under the
 authority of a trauma service area regional advisory council.
 (c)  The administrative cooperatives and advisory councils
 shall develop and submit the emergency health care services
 coordination plan to the department not later than September 1,
 2021.  This subsection expires September 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  Section 773.112, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The executive commissioner, in consultation with the
 department, shall conduct a comprehensive review of the rules
 adopted under this section every seven years.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter E, Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 773.125, 773.126, 773.127, and
 773.128 to read as follows:
 Sec. 773.125.  ADMINISTRATIVE COOPERATIVES: DESIGNATION.
 (a) The department shall designate eight or more administrative
 cooperatives to provide administrative functions for each trauma
 service area regional advisory council located in the public health
 region served by the cooperative.  When designating the
 administrative cooperative for a public health region, the
 department shall consider:
 (1)  any local support for an administrative
 cooperative applicant within the public health region; and
 (2)  the geographic area of and number of individuals
 served by each trauma service area regional advisory council
 located in the public health region.
 (b)  A trauma service area regional advisory council may
 apply to the department in accordance with department rules to be
 designated as an administrative cooperative for other trauma
 service area regional advisory councils in the public health
 region.
 (c)  An applicant must demonstrate the applicant has the
 personnel, knowledge, skills, and resources necessary to provide
 the administrative functions for each trauma service area regional
 advisory council in the applicant's public health region.
 (c-1)  An applicant must submit an initial application under
 Subsection (b) not later than December 1, 2018.  The department
 shall designate qualified applicants to serve as administrative
 cooperatives not later than December 1, 2019.  An applicant
 designated to serve as an administrative cooperative under this
 subsection shall carry out the duties imposed by Section 773.126 as
 soon as practicable after the selection and not later than December
 1, 2020.  This subsection expires September 1, 2021.
 (d)  If a trauma service area regional advisory council
 eligible to serve as an administrative cooperative under this
 section has not applied for the designation in a public health
 region, the department shall designate the trauma service area
 regional advisory council with the most appropriate qualifications
 in the public health region to serve as the administrative
 cooperative for that region.
 Sec. 773.126.  ADMINISTRATIVE COOPERATIVES: DUTIES. (a)
 Except as provided by Section 773.128, an administrative
 cooperative shall perform all administrative functions, including
 contract management, grant application management, employee
 benefit management, human resource management, and payroll, for
 each trauma service area regional advisory council under the
 cooperative's jurisdiction. Administrative functions do not
 include program activities or activity coordination performed by a
 trauma service area regional advisory council under the
 administrative cooperative's jurisdiction.
 (b)  The department shall directly contract with an
 administrative cooperative for administrative duties provided by
 the cooperative as required by this section.
 (c)  An administrative cooperative shall administer and
 distribute funds to each trauma service area regional advisory
 council under the cooperative's jurisdiction in accordance with
 department rules. In adopting rules under this subsection, the
 executive commissioner shall require an administrative cooperative
 to distribute funds according to a trauma service area regional
 advisory council's population, annual number of trauma care runs,
 geographic size, and annual number of deaths.
 (d)  An administrative cooperative shall enter into a
 centralized purchasing agreement with the trauma service area
 regional advisory councils under the cooperative's jurisdiction
 and other cooperatives to consolidate purchases for the trauma
 service area regional advisory councils as appropriate.
 (e)  An administrative cooperative shall submit to the
 department in the manner required by the department an annual
 report on the amount of money spent by the administrative
 cooperative in providing consolidated administrative services for
 the trauma service area regional advisory councils under the
 cooperative's jurisdiction compared to the amount of money that
 would have been spent if each trauma service area regional advisory
 council had provided its own administrative services.
 Sec. 773.127.  ADMINISTRATIVE COOPERATIVES: TRANSFER OF
 TRAUMA SERVICE AREA REGIONAL ADVISORY COUNCILS. (a) A trauma
 service area regional advisory council may apply to the department
 in accordance with department rules for a transfer from the
 jurisdiction of the trauma service area regional advisory council's
 administrative cooperative to the jurisdiction of another
 administrative cooperative willing and capable of providing
 administrative services for the trauma service area regional
 advisory council in a more cost-effective manner than the current
 administrative cooperative's provision of the services.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall develop criteria for
 determining whether an administrative cooperative has the
 personnel, knowledge, skills, and resources necessary to provide
 administrative services in a more cost-effective manner for a
 trauma service area regional advisory council applying for a
 transfer to that administrative cooperative's jurisdiction under
 this section.
 Sec. 773.128.  ADMINISTRATIVE COOPERATIVES: REQUEST BY
 TRAUMA SERVICE AREA REGIONAL ADVISORY COUNCIL TO RETAIN CERTAIN
 ADMINISTRATIVE FUNCTIONS. (a) A trauma service area regional
 advisory council may file a written request with the department to
 retain an administrative function delegated to an administrative
 cooperative. The request must include evidence the trauma service
 area regional advisory council has the personnel, knowledge,
 skills, and resources necessary to perform the administrative
 function in a more cost-effective manner than the current
 administrative cooperative's performance of the function.
 (b)  The department shall grant a request that includes
 sufficient evidence for the department to determine the trauma
 service area regional advisory council has the personnel,
 knowledge, skills, and resources required by this section and shall
 notify the administrative cooperative of the department's
 decision.
 SECTION 4.  The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt all rules necessary to
 implement the change in law made by this Act not later than May 1,
 2018.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract executed on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 contract executed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law applicable to the contract immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect December 1, 2017.