1 | | - | H.B. No. 7 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Phelan, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 7 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House July 31, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | August 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; August 8, 2017, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 4; August 8, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 7 By: Campbell |
---|
8 | | - | SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 212, Local Government |
---|
| 16 | + | SECTION 1. Section 212.003(a), Local Government Code, is |
---|
| 17 | + | amended to read as follows: |
---|
| 18 | + | (a) The governing body of a municipality by ordinance may |
---|
| 19 | + | extend to the extraterritorial jurisdiction of the municipality the |
---|
| 20 | + | application of municipal ordinances adopted under Section 212.002 |
---|
| 21 | + | and other municipal ordinances relating to access to public roads |
---|
| 22 | + | or the pumping, extraction, and use of groundwater by persons other |
---|
| 23 | + | than retail public utilities, as defined by Section 13.002, Water |
---|
| 24 | + | Code, for the purpose of preventing the use of or contact with |
---|
| 25 | + | groundwater that presents an actual or potential threat to human |
---|
| 26 | + | health. However, unless otherwise authorized by state law, in its |
---|
| 27 | + | extraterritorial jurisdiction a municipality shall not regulate: |
---|
| 28 | + | (1) the use of any building or property for business, |
---|
| 29 | + | industrial, residential, or other purposes; |
---|
| 30 | + | (2) the bulk, height, or number of buildings |
---|
| 31 | + | constructed on a particular tract of land; |
---|
| 32 | + | (3) the size of a building that can be constructed on a |
---|
| 33 | + | particular tract of land, including without limitation any |
---|
| 34 | + | restriction on the ratio of building floor space to the land square |
---|
| 35 | + | footage; |
---|
| 36 | + | (4) the number of residential units that can be built |
---|
| 37 | + | per acre of land; [or] |
---|
| 38 | + | (5) the size, type, or method of construction of a |
---|
| 39 | + | water or wastewater facility that can be constructed to serve a |
---|
| 40 | + | developed tract of land if: |
---|
| 41 | + | (A) the facility meets the minimum standards |
---|
| 42 | + | established for water or wastewater facilities by state and federal |
---|
| 43 | + | regulatory entities; and |
---|
| 44 | + | (B) the developed tract of land is: |
---|
| 45 | + | (i) located in a county with a population of |
---|
| 46 | + | 2.8 million or more; and |
---|
| 47 | + | (ii) served by: |
---|
| 48 | + | (a) on-site septic systems |
---|
| 49 | + | constructed before September 1, 2001, that fail to provide adequate |
---|
| 50 | + | services; or |
---|
| 51 | + | (b) on-site water wells constructed |
---|
| 52 | + | before September 1, 2001, that fail to provide an adequate supply of |
---|
| 53 | + | safe drinking water; or |
---|
| 54 | + | (6) the ability of an owner of property that has been |
---|
| 55 | + | platted to remove a tree or vegetation on the owner's property, |
---|
| 56 | + | except as necessary to mitigate tree-borne diseases as recommended |
---|
| 57 | + | by the Texas A&M Forest Service, including by: |
---|
| 58 | + | (A) requiring the owner to file an affidavit or |
---|
| 59 | + | notice before removing the tree or vegetation; or |
---|
| 60 | + | (B) imposing a tree mitigation fee. |
---|
| 61 | + | SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 212, Local Government |
---|
9 | 62 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 212.905 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 63 | | Sec. 212.905. REGULATION OF TREE REMOVAL. (a) In this |
---|
11 | 64 | | section: |
---|
12 | 65 | | (1) "Residential structure" means: |
---|
13 | 66 | | (A) a manufactured home as that term is defined |
---|
14 | 67 | | by Section 1201.003, Occupations Code; |
---|
15 | 68 | | (B) a detached one-family or two-family |
---|
16 | 69 | | dwelling, including the accessory structures of the dwelling; |
---|
17 | 70 | | (C) a multiple single-family dwelling that is not |
---|
18 | 71 | | more than three stories in height with a separate means of entry for |
---|
19 | 72 | | each dwelling, including the accessory structures of the dwelling; |
---|
20 | 73 | | or |
---|
21 | 74 | | (D) any other multifamily structure. |
---|
22 | 75 | | (2) "Tree mitigation fee" means a fee or charge |
---|
23 | 76 | | imposed by a municipality in connection with the removal of a tree |
---|
24 | 77 | | from private property. |
---|
59 | | - | (A) the property is a residential structure or |
---|
60 | | - | pertains to the development, construction, or renovation of a |
---|
61 | | - | residential structure; and |
---|
62 | | - | (B) the person is developing, constructing, or |
---|
63 | | - | renovating the property not for use as the person's residence; or |
---|
| 105 | + | (A) the property is a residential structure that |
---|
| 106 | + | is not occupied by the person; and |
---|
| 107 | + | (B) the person is constructing or renovating the |
---|
| 108 | + | residential structure for sale as a residential structure and not |
---|
| 109 | + | for use as the person's residence; or |
---|
93 | | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect December 1, 2017. |
---|
94 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
95 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
96 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 7 was passed by the House on July 28, |
---|
97 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 130, Nays 9, 1 present, not |
---|
98 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
99 | | - | No. 7 on August 15, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 119, Nays 23, |
---|
100 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
101 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
102 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
103 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 7 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
104 | | - | amendments, on August 15, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 17, |
---|
105 | | - | Nays 14. |
---|
106 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
107 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
108 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
109 | | - | Date |
---|
110 | | - | __________________ |
---|
111 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 147 | + | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect December 1, 2017. |
---|
| 148 | + | * * * * * |
---|