House | 08/03/2017 | Recommitted to committee | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Postponed | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Amended | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 08/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 08/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 07/31/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/31/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/28/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 07/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 07/20/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 07/20/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 07/10/2017 | Filed |