LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th 1st C.S.
Senate
Bills
SB11
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.
Texas Senate Bill SB11
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
July 12, 2017
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
July 26, 2017
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 15, 2017
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
August 10, 2017
Compare
Bill
July 22, 2017
Compare