House
|
08/14/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
|
House
|
08/13/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
08/13/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
08/13/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
08/12/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
08/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/24/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/24/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Point of order
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|